United Community Bank v. Campbell et al
Petitioner: |
United Community Bank |
Respondent: |
Lillie Campbell, Robert A Weiser, Sylvia M Weiser and Olanrewaju Wusu |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00079 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Buncombe |
Nature of Suit: |
Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause of Action: |
27 U.S.C. § 185 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER REQUIRING RECEIVER TO PAY OVER FUNDS TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR OF OLANREWAJE WUSU PURSUANT TO N.C. Gen. Stat. § 1-360. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/01/2015. (klb)
|
April 17, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting 19 MOTION Pursuant to N.C. Gen. Stat. § 1-360 as to Judgment Debtor Olanrewaje Wusu. Receiver Joseph W. Grier shall appear before the Court and testify concerning any funds in his possessio n belonging to Judgment Debtor Olanrewaje Wusu. Hearing set for 5/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. In lieu of appearing at the hearing, the Receiver may file a verified statemen t setting forth the specific amount of funds in his possession that are owed or belong to the Judgment Debtor Olanrewaje Wusu. FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver shall freeze the funds in his possession that belong to the Judgment Debtor Olanrewaje Wusu andnot otherwise distribute them. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/17/2015. (nv)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Final Execution and Issuance of Writ of Execution, and the Judgment Debtor is precluded from having any of his property set aside as exempt from Judgment in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final execution be issued by the Clerk of this Court for the Collection of the Judgment in this case. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/11/2015. (thh)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
12
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Lillie Campbell, Robert A. Weiser, Jr, Sylvia M Weiser, Olanrewaju Wusu. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on March 1, 2011. (jhg)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing
9
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Entry of Default. NOW THEREFORE, default is hereby entered against Respondent Lillie Campbell, only, as the other defendants answer deadline are not due yet. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on September 2, 2010. (jhg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?