Deyton
Petitioner: |
Josiah Jacob Deyton |
Respondent: |
Alvin W. Keller and Lander Corpening |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00127 |
Filed: |
June 21, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Mitchell |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
26
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Memorandum of Decision and Order dated 9/27/2011. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
|
September 21, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:10cv127, 1:10cv128, 1:10cv 129. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 1:10cv127 only. Member Cases: 1:10cv128 and 1:10cv129 to be administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/21/10. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00127-MR -DLH, 1:10-cv-00128-MR -DLH, 1:10-cv-00129-MR -DLH(nll)
|
August 20, 2010 |
Filing
6
ORDER granting petitioners Motions to Hold Federal Habeas Proceedings in Abeyance #s 3 are GRANTED and this action is STAYED pending disposition by the North Carolina Supreme Court of petitioners applications for writs of certiorari (see order for further details and deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on August 20, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00127, 1:10-cv-00128 and 1:10-cv-00129.(nll)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing
4
ORDER granting 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis, therefor, all process issued in connection with this action shall be served by the US Marshal at the Gov's expense; consideration of P etitioners 3 MOTION to Hold 1 Federal Habeas Proceedings in Abeyance is deferred pending the filing by the Respondents, by and through the NC Atty Gen, of a RESPONSE to such motion.(Response due by 7/30/2010 & Petitioner's Reply due by 8/10/2010); Motions terminated: 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/1/10. (ejb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?