Klopfer et al v. Queens Gap Mountain, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Frank E. Klopfer, Kathy M. Klopfer, Dustin P. Swartz and Kristin H. Swartz |
Defendant: |
Queens Gap Mountain, LLC, Devinshire Land Development, LLC, Ryan P. McCarthy, Devin F. McCarthy, Keith A. Vinson, Queens Gap Acquisition, LLC, Cove Creek, LLC, Queens Gap Holding Company, LLC and D.F. McCarthy XVIII, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00155 |
Filed: |
July 27, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Buncombe |
Presiding Judge: |
David Keesler |
Presiding Judge: |
Martin Reidinger |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER accepting 61 Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Recommendations;denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file within 45 days hereof a Notice ind icating that (1) an Arbitrator has been selected, (2) the name of the proposed Arbitrator, and (3) a proposed commencement date or schedule for Arbitration to begin. Should Plaintiffs fail timely to file such Notice, the Court will enter an order dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/01/2013. (thh)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying 53 Pltfs' Motion to Allow Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/6/11. (ejb)
|
September 15, 2011 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 24 the McCarthy Defts' Motion to Compel & to Stay, and 29 the Queens Gap Defts' Motion to Stay & to Compel and arbitration is hereby compelled and this action is STAYED; and denying as moot 44 Defts D. R. McCarthy Investments XVIII, LLC's; Queens Gap Holding Company, LLC's; Devin McCarthy's & Janis L. McCarthy's Motion for Reconsideration or, in the alternative, Deft Janis L. McCarthys Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/14/11. (ejb)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER re 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, D.F. McCarthy XVIII, LLC answer due 10/11/2010; Devinshire Land Development, LLC answer due 10/11/2010; Devin F. McCarthy answer due 10/11/2010; Ryan P. McCarthy answer due 10/11/2010; Queens Gap Holding Company, LLC answer due 10/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on August 24, 2010. (jhg)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER re 1 Complaint, that Plaintiffs file and serve a Notice of Citizenship of all LLC Defendants, on or before September 3, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on August 24, 2010. (jhg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?