Bailey et al v. Polk County, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Max Bailey, Margaret Dalton, Carlton Bill Huntley, K. C., A. D. and Steve Marlowe
Defendant: Polk County, North Carolina, Polk County Sheriff's Department, Matthew Prince, Trent Carswell, Chris Marino Abril, Charles Grady Shehan, Jr, Unknown Police Officers and Unknown Law Enforcement Agencies
Case Number: 1:2010cv00264
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Polk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/19/12. (as directed 2 certified copies mailed to Clerk of Superior Court of Polk County, NC)(ejb)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 50 Motion to Appear by Telephone for 9/28/2012 Hearing; status conference set in this matter for 9/28/2012 is continued and will be held on 10/1/2012 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom #2 of the United States Courthouse in Asheville, North Carolina. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/14/12. (ejb)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/11/2012. (thh)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to conduct Status Conference re 46 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Unopposed MOTION to Reopen Case , ( Status Conference set for 9/13/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/29/2012. (thh)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/13/12. (ejb)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 21 Polk County, Polk County Sheriffs Partial Motion to Dismiss; adopting Memorandum and Recommendations re 24 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying 28 Pltfs' Motion for Le ave to File Amended Complaint; parties shall file supplemental briefs on or before 10/14/11 addressing whether Pltf Huntley's remaining § 1983 claim for false arrest has abated (see order for full details). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/29/11. (ejb)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Substitute Party. Casey Joe Huntley added as the personal representative of the Estate of Carlton Bill Huntley. Carlton Bill Huntley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on April 4, 2011. (jhg)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that plaintiffs file appropriate motions for appointment of guardians ad litem within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on January 6, 2011. (jhg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Polk County, North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Bailey
Represented By: Ben C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Dalton
Represented By: Ben C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Bill Huntley
Represented By: Ben C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. C.
Represented By: Ben C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. D.
Represented By: Ben C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Marlowe
Represented By: Ben C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Marino Abril
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Grady Shehan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Law Enforcement Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?