Synovus Bank v. Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. and George M. Gabler
Case Number: 1:2011cv00015
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Synovus Bank against George M. Gabler, Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 1/14/13. (ejb)
January 7, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Show Cause Order 16 is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/04/2013. (thh)
July 3, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Vacate 10 Default Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/03/2012. (thh)
June 28, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against George M. Gabler, Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. Signed by District Clerk Frank G. Johns on 6/28/2011. (jhg)
March 14, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff file an appropriate motion or take further action to move this case forward not later than March 25, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on March 14, 2011. (jhg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Gabler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?