Leblow et al v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Plaintiff: James R. Leblow and Laura T. Leblow
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, Brock & Scott, PLLC, Ratestar, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, Home Owners Loan Corporation, US Mortgage Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Merscorp
Case Number: 1:2012cv00246
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Transylvania
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 06/17/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 06/15/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting 33 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 13 , 14 & 32 Motions to Dismiss. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff shall show good cause in writing within 14 days of service of this Order for the failure to effect service on the Defendants US Mortgage Corporation and Ratestar, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/25/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John Paul Scott, Jr for Home Owners Loan Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/4/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re: File Response on or before November 28, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/8/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Waiver to the extent it seeks an Order allowing him leave to file pleadings electronically in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/22/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leblow et al v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Andrew Francis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC
Represented By: Marc S. Asbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratestar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Andrew Francis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Andrew Francis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Owners Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Francis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp
Represented By: Andrew Francis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Leblow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura T. Leblow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?