McAdoo v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Carl E. McAdoo |
Defendant: |
Ann Padgett, Joyce Ann Nash, United States of America, Sonny W. Tucker, Jr., Sandy F. Pierce, Rutherford County Department of Social Services, John Carroll and Vic Martin |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00328 |
Filed: |
October 19, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Buncombe |
Presiding Judge: |
Dennis Howell |
Presiding Judge: |
Martin Reidinger |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying as moot the 73 Motion to Strike and 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 72 Amended Complaint. The Court STRIKES the 72 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/28/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(klb)
|
March 17, 2014 |
Filing
67
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 03/17/14. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration re 63 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing
63
ORDER directing Pltf obtain counsel by 3/5/2013; upon entry of an appearance by counsel, the Court will allow counsel 20 days to file an amended complaint; if Pltf fails to comply with this Order and obtain counsel within time allowed, the Court will recommend the District Court dismiss this action in its entirety without prejudice; and pending 48 & 50 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/3/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
|
June 27, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER striking 51 Response & 52 Sealed Exhibits; denying as moot 53 Motion to Restrict Exhibit 3, 54 Motion to Corrected Motion and 55 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until July 10, 2013, to f ile a response to the Motions to Dismiss that complies with the prior Orders of this Court and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/26/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh) Modified text on 6/27/2013 (ejb).
|
May 28, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Seal 41 Exhibits 1-30 of 40 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/28/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw) Modified text on 5/28/2013 (emw). NEF regenerated.
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have until May 20, 2013, to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/02/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER granting Pltf's 30 & 36 Motions to Seal Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/27/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying 10 Pltf's Motion for Default Judgment as to Deft. Joyce Ann Nash; granting 11 Deft Joyce Ann Nash's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying as moot 19 Deft Joyce Ann Nash's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/11/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?