Lee v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Plaintiff: Charles T. Lee
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00004
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/11/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that the Pltf's 54 "NOTICE to Agent is Notice to Principal" is hereby deemed to be a MOTION to Amend the Complaint, and the Deft shall respond to such motion within 14 days from the entry of this Order. ( Responses due by 5/10/2016). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/26/15. (Pro se litigant served via regular US Mail at address shown on the Docket of this case and at address(es) shown on the Notice.) (ejb)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that Deft shall have 14 days from entry of this Order to file a supplemental brief in support of its 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Pltf shall have 14 days from filing of Deft's supplemental brief to file a response. A supplemental reply brief shall not be permitted. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/22/15. (ejb)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 05/20/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 05/20/2014. (thh)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 15 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/28/13. (ejb)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William Cox Tucker, Jr for Charles T. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 03/08/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T. Lee
Represented By: Rachel Scott Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Nicole A. Crawford
Represented By: Max Daniel McGinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?