Scherer et al v. Steel Creek Property Owners Association

Plaintiff: William R. Scherer and Anne Scherer
Defendant: Steel Creek Property Owners Association, Paul Iooss and Stephen Iooss
Case Number: 1:2013cv00121
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Transylvania
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/30/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (kby)
June 2, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 142 MOTION to Compel . The Court directs the parties to jointly indicate in writing by June 5, 2015, whether a ruling on the 142 Motion to Compel is required by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/2/2015. (nv)
April 29, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties and witness Robert Dungan appear at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, April 30, 2015, before the undersigned in Asheville, North Carolina, court room number 1, to be heard on this matter re 135 Joint MOTION to Stay re 131 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/29/2015. (thh)
April 24, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties and counsel for the witness, Robert Dungan to appear for a ( Discovery Hearing set for 4/28/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) The Court will address any outstanding discovery motions or issues at hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/24/15. (ejb)
April 15, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying with leave to review the Motion to Compel [#99]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/15/15. (emw)
April 14, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Motion to Limit Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/14/15. (emw) Modified text on 4/14/2015 (ejb).
April 10, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Objection to Motion to Quash Subpoena of Robert Dungan 74 is DENIED with respect to advice he has provided to Steel Creek Property Owners Association and its board of directors related to any of the claims ass erted by Plaintiffs in this case. It is further directed that Mr. Dungan will not be required to answer any question posed to him concerning his representation of the former Defendant Stephen Iooss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/10/2015. (thh)
April 8, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ivan J. Kopas for Anne Scherer and William R. Scherer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/08/15. (emw)
February 4, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing 71 Motion to Modify Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Parties shall be allowed up to and including 5/1/2015 to complete discovery, 4/1/2015 to complete mediation, and 5/15/2015 to file dispositive motions. Scheduling of the trial will remain on the calendar for the 8/31/2015 session. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/04/2015. (klb)
May 27, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting 52 Memorandum and Recommendations; rejecting 56 Pltf's Objections; granting 25 Deft Steel Creek Property Owners Association's Motion to Dismiss Count One of Pltfs' Amended Complaint; gran ting 30 Deft Steven Iooss' Motion to Dismiss Count Nine, and terminating Deft Steven Iooss as a party to this action; denying remaining claims in Deft Steel Creek Property Owners Association's Motion to Dismiss 25 as well as 23 Deft Paul Iooss' Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Pltfs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as contained in paragraph 135(f) of Pltfs' Amended Complaint [Doc. 5 at 60] and dismissing that claim, together with Pltfs' claim of attorneys' fees associated with it. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/27/14. (emw)
March 3, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 26 and 29 Motions to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/03/2014. (thh)
May 14, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Albert L. Frevola for Anne Scherer and Albert L. Frevola for William R. Scherer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/13/2013. (thh) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/14/2013) (thh). Modified on 5/14/2013 to correct Attorney's Middle Initial (thh). (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/14/2013) (thh). Modified on 5/14/2013 to correct attorney's middle initial, NEF regenerated (thh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scherer et al v. Steel Creek Property Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Albert Louis Frevola, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Kimzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Scherer
Represented By: Albert Louis Frevola, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Kimzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Creek Property Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Iooss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Iooss
Represented By: Robert Edward Dungan
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?