Wilkins et al v. Belmont Industries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Wilkins and Mary Anne Wilkins
Defendant: Belmont Industries Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Dana Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., General Electric Company, The Good Year Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, John Crane Inc., McNeil & NRM, Inc., McNeil (Ohio) Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, 3M Company, Sepco Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Trane U.S. Inc. and Warren Pumps Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00165
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 156 Joint Motion to Dismiss Pltfs' claims against the Deft Metropolitan Life Insurance Company WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/6/15. (ejb)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER that Pltf shall file stipulations of dismissal of her claims against Defts Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Industrial Holdings Corporation within 14 days of entry of this Order, or the Court will dismiss such claims without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/27/15. (ejb)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting parties' 152 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and Pltfs' claims against Defts Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, and Daniel International Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/11/15. (ejb)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 150 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Pltfs' claims against Deft Goulds Pumps, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/23/14. (ejb)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 148 Consent Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice CBS Corporation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/31/2014. (thh)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 142 Joint Motion to Dismiss Pltfs' claims against Deft 3M Company WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/14. (ejb)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that within 14 days of the entry of this Order, Pltf and each settling Deft shall file a memorandum of settlement with the Court setting out basic terms of the parties' settlement agreement. Such memoranda may be fi led under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that each settling Deft shall pay all sums required by the parties' respective settlement agreements and the parties shall file all such documents with the Court so as to effectuate the closing of the court file w ithin 60 days of entry of this Order, unless additional time is sought and granted by the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Pltf shall take such action as is necessary to dismiss her claims against Deft 3M Company within 14 days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/13/14. (ejb)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 125 Motion to Dismiss and the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant McNeil & NRM, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/08/14. (emw)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 113 Motion to Substitute Mary Anne Wilkins for Joseph M. Wilkins as the Plaintiff in this action; granting 114 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the entry of this Order to file her Amended Complaint. Joseph M. Wilkins terminated as party plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/29/2014. (khm)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying 109 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/26/2014. (klb)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Dismiss and the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant McNeil (Ohio) Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/07/14. (emw)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Dismiss and the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant John Crane Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/06/14. (emw)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Dismiss and the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Crane Co. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/02/14. (emw)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/26/14. (emw)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Dismiss Pltfs' claims against Deft Belmont Industries, Inc. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/20/14. (ejb)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 89 Motion to Dismiss and all claims of the Plaintiffs against Defendant Grinnell LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/20/14. (emw)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file an appropriate motion or otherwise take further action with respect to the Defendant Belmont Industries Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/8/2014. (nv)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. David Conner for Dana Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated and ITT Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/21/2014. (thh)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER on or before 11/25/13, Defts Grinnell LLC and Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC shall file response disclosing names and citizenships, if any, of all constituent members or partners of above referenced LLCs, and for any s uch constituent members or partners that are limited liability companies or partnerships shall identify citizenships of respective constituent members or partners until all such constituents are fully identified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/23/13. (ejb)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John Everett Guerry, III for Joseph M. Wilkins,John Everett Guerry, III for Mary Anne Wilkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/08/2013. (thh)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric A. Ludwig for Sepco Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/01/13. (emw)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added V. Brian Bevon for Joseph M. Wilkins abd Mary Anne Wilkins. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/10/13. (emw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins et al v. Belmont Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Wilkins
Represented By: V. Brian Bevon
Represented By: John David Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Wilkins
Represented By: V. Brian Bevon
Represented By: John David Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Good Year Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil & NRM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil (Ohio) Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?