Hensley et al v. Suttles et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Hensley, H. H. and Rachelle Ferguson
Defendant: Bobby R Suttles, Michael Scott Price, Keith Allen Beasley, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, West American Insurance Company and The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00193
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 110 Plaintiff's "Motion Pursuant to Rule 59 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for a Judgment Not Withstanding the Verdict or in the Alternitive [sic] for a New Trial, Rule 50(b)." Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/24/2019. (khm)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 JUDGMENT: The Plaintiffs shall recover nothing from the Defendants in the form of damages. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDCE in its entirety, and the Defendants shall recover their costs of the action from the Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/26/2018. (maf)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct Caption of Pleadings [Doc. 79 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent stated in this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/18/2018. (maf)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that the stay previously entered in this case in LIFTED, and this matter is hereby scheduled for trial during 5/14/2018 trial term. The Court does not anticipate calling this matter for trial any earlier than May 21, 201 8. FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference shall be held on Friday, May 11, 2018, 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/25/2018. (khm)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 69 Motion to Stay pending the U. S. Supreme Court's ruling on the Defendants' petition for writ of certiorari. The parties shall notify the Court within 14 days of the Supreme Court's action on Defendants' petition. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/19/2018. (maf) Modified docket text on 2/20/2018 to correct signature date. (maf)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUPPLEMENTAL Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Jury Trial set for the first civil term beginning on or after 3/12/2018 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger.) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/18/2017. (khm)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying without prejudice 59 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/12/2017. (ejb)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/30/2016. (thh)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment, see order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants Bobby R. Suttles, Larry Bryson, David Mitchell is GRANTED with regard to all of Plaintiffs' Causes of Action against them and such Defendants are hereby DISMISSED from this matter. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/9/2016. (nvc)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Defendant's 41 Motion to Seal. Defendants shall be permitted to file Exhibit B to the Affidavit of Chad Thompson under seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/3/2015. (nv)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Substitute Party, for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/24/2014. (nv)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/11/14. (nv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley et al v. Suttles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Hensley
Represented By: Russell L. McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. H.
Represented By: Russell L. McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Ferguson
Represented By: Russell L. McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby R Suttles
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Price
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Allen Beasley
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?