US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. OTC Investments LLC et al

Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: OTC Investments LLC, Forex Currency Trade Advisors, LLC and Barry C. Taylor
Case Number: 1:2015cv00081
Filed: April 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 7:6
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Orders dated 1/19/2018 (Doc. Nos. 67 and 68). Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 MOTION and Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Modify or Clarify Asset-Freeze Provisions of Court's Orders of Preliminary Injunction re 31 Preliminary Injunction, 28 Preliminary Injuncti on. Released funds to be remitted directly to the Clerk of the Court so that such funds may be applied towards Taylor's restitution obligation in the criminal case no. 1:16-cr-00002. (See Order for further details.) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/14/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Stay. Discovery in this matter shall be stayed for an additional period of 90 days from entry of this Order. It is Further Ordered that the Court shall enter a Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan upon expiration of the limited stay of discovery. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/3/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Stay Discovery for Ninety Days. The Commission shall be allowed to issue third party subpoenas to financial institutions. The Court shall enter a Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan upon the expiration of the limited stay of discovery. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/4/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Stay and discovery in this matter shall be stayed for an additional period of 90 days from the entry of this Order. The Commission shall be allowed to issue third party subpoenas to financial institutions during this 90-day period. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/02/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail. Copy of order mailed to Barry C. Taylor)(emw)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/03/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Deft Barry C. Taylor's 37 Motion to Stay, GRANTED IN PART, to extent (1) discovery in this matter shall be stayed for a period of 120 days from entry of this Order, and (2) Co mmission shall be allowed to issue third party subpoenas to financial institutions during this 120-day period. Except as granted, Deft's Motion is otherwise DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/6/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/6/15. (ejb)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/23/15. (emw)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to OTC Investments LLC and Forex Currency Trading Advisors, LLC. Pending the entry of a formal preliminary injunction order, the preliminary injunction shall impose th e same terms as the Statutory Restraining Order as previously entered. 11 Statutory Restraining Order entered by the Court is CONTINUED IN EFFECT as to the Defendant Barry C. Taylor until 5/29/15. Hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and return of Statutory Restraining Order as to the Defendant Barry C. Taylor is hereby CONTINUED to 05/29/15 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/15/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 11 Temporary Restraining Order is CONTINUED IN EFFECT and shall expire at 11:59 p.m. on Friday, May 15, 2015, unless before that time the Court, for good cause, extends it for a like period. Hearing for a return of the Statutory Restraining Order set for 5/15/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/01/15. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. OTC Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: JonMarc P. Buffa(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Peter M. Haas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTC Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forex Currency Trade Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry C. Taylor
Represented By: D. Rodney Kight, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?