McAfee v. Howard Baer, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mercedes Kamaria Powell McAfee
Defendant: Howard Baer, Inc. and Keith Lovell Campbell
Case Number: 1:2015cv00182
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint notice that they have settled the case by 3/5/2018. Further the Court directs parties to file a stipulation of dismissal by 3/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/28/2018. (kby)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying Defts' 112 Supplemental Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/21/2018. (ejb)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 95 Defendant's Motion in Limine as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/13/2018. (khm)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER that Pltf's 93 MOTION in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part with the remainder to be ruled on during the trial; Defts' 95 MOTION in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part with the remainder to be ruled on during trial. Jury Trial tentatively set to begin on Monday, 3/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/08/2018. (ejb)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that this case is set for Jury Trial in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell at 09:01 AM on the 3/5/2018, trial calendar following the completion of criminal matters; partie s are DIRECTED to APPEAR for Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell; any Motions in limine are due by 1/25/2018, and any responses thereto are due by 2/01/2018. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/12/2018. (ejb)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 81 Motion for Sanctions. The Court also INSTRUCTS Plaintiff that the filing of any further discovery motions in this case may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for Plaintiff for continuing to disregard the lawful orders of this Court. The Court further INSTRUCTS the parties that no extension of time to file dispositive motions shall be granted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/26/17. (emw)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING as moot 55 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/30/2017. (khm)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 23 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions. (See Order for details). The Court EXTENDS the discovery deadlines in this case until 11/15/2016, and the summary judgment deadline until 12/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/18/2016. (khm)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Discovery Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/1/2016. (nvc)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part 8 Motion to Compel. The Court DIRECTS Defendant Howard Baer, Inc. to respond fully to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents within 10 days of the entr y of this Order. The Court AWARDS Plaintiff her reasonable expenses, including attorneys' fees, in filing this motion. The Court EXTENDS the deadline for Plaintiff to provide her expert reports until 3/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/28/2016. (khm)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 8 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions: Plaintiff shall file with the Court copies of all Interrogatories and all Request for Production of Documents served upon Defendants and responses to those Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories provided by Defendants, if any, on or before 1/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/7/2016. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAfee v. Howard Baer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Kamaria Powell McAfee
Represented By: W. Perry Fisher, II
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Baer, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Clifford Kurdys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lovell Campbell
Represented By: Mark Clifford Kurdys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?