Vinson v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Kevin Vinson
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00213
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay. The Court stays these proceedings until a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of a pending Motion for Transfer and Centralization of this and related actions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/21/2015. (nv)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Catharine E. Edwards for Donald Kevin Vinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/20/2015. (nv)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Patrick H. Garrard for Donald Kevin Vinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/29/2015. (nv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kevin Vinson
Represented By: William B. Bystrynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?