Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Temp-Vent Corporation

Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Temp-Vent Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv00221
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney co-counsel Katherine M. Pomroy, the Court directs the Clerk to remove Katherine Pomroy as attorney of record in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/2016. (nvc)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Joint Motion to Vacate the Court's December 22, 2015 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. The Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan (#8) previously entered in this matter is ordered to be null and of no force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/03/16. (emw)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Substitute Party. Air Vent, Inc. added. Temp-Vent Corporation terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/20/16. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Temp-Vent Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Albert Sanford Nalibotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temp-Vent Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?