Rutland et al v. Dugas et al

Plaintiff: John W. Rutland, III, Joseph L. Ellen, Donna M. Ellen, Carl W. Bridenstine and Cynthia S. Bridenstine
Defendant: Terri Hope Dugas, Anthony M. Milici, Pathumwan Milici and Selena Michelle Milici
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Terri Hope Dugas
Thirdparty_defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, Anthony Phillips, Joseph Hall and Gloria B. Hall
Counter_claimant: Terri Hope Dugas
Counter_defendant: John W. Rutland, III, Joseph L. Ellen, Donna M. Ellen, Carl W. Bridenstine and Cynthia S. Bridenstine
Case Number: 1:2015cv00228
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: McDowell
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 6/17/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns.(khm)
February 8, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Terri Hope Dugas shall have an additional fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order to respond to USFS's motion for summary judgment. Denying 20 Motion for Expedited and Limited Discovery and denying 24 Motion to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/08/16. (emw)
December 18, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 12 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Third-Party Defendant United States of America shall be treated by the Court as a motion for summary judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Third -Party Plaintiff's deadline for responding to Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED for 14 days from the entry of this Order. If the Third-Party Plaintiff wishes to conduct limited discovery on an expedited basis prior to responding, she shall file a motion to that effect. FURTHER ORDERED that except as otherwise stated in this Order, this action is hereby STAYED pending resolution of USFS's Motion for Summary Judgment.IT. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1:15cv228. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutland et al v. Dugas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Rutland, III
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Ellen
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Ellen
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl W. Bridenstine
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia S. Bridenstine
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Hope Dugas
Represented By: R. Daniel Boyce
Represented By: Alex R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony M. Milici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathumwan Milici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selena Michelle Milici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Terri Hope Dugas
Represented By: R. Daniel Boyce
Represented By: Alex R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Anthony Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Joseph Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Gloria B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Terri Hope Dugas
Represented By: R. Daniel Boyce
Represented By: Alex R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John W. Rutland, III
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joseph L. Ellen
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donna M. Ellen
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Carl W. Bridenstine
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cynthia S. Bridenstine
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?