TD Bank, N.A. v. Carland Tractor and Equip., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TD Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Carland Tractor and Equip., Inc., Anthony E. Carland, Max Lowe Carland, Jr. and Ellen C. Carland
Case Number: 1:2015cv00248
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of the Plaintiff TD Bank, N.A. against Anthony E. Carland, Carland Tractor and Equip., Inc. (ejb)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that within 14 days Pltf shall file an appropriate motion or otherwise take further action with respect to Defts Carland Tractor and Equip. Inc. and Anthony E. Carland. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/22/17. (ejb)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT in favor of TD Bank, N.A. against Defendants Ellen C. Carland, Max Lowe Carland, Jr. jointly and severally in the amount of $249,628.29 plus attorneys' fees of $30,036.94. The costs of this action are taxed against the Defendants. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/10/2017. (khm)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice Pltf's 27 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Carland Tractor and Equip., Inc. and 28 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Anthony E. Carland. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/13/16. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TD Bank, N.A. v. Carland Tractor and Equip., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Norman J. Leonard, II
Represented By: Lance P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carland Tractor and Equip., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony E. Carland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Lowe Carland, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen C. Carland
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?