Pickens v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: |
Brandon Michael Pickens |
Defendant: |
Robert C. Lewis, R. Beddingfield, John S. Carbone, Donna L. Woodruff, J. Rickman, Ken Yearick, Susan White, North Carolina Prison Legal Services, Inc., Elizabeth Albitson, Sarah J. Farber and Jennie Lancaster |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00275 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Mitchell |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 11, 2018 |
Filing
104
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 05/11/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
|
November 20, 2017 |
Filing
97
AMENDED ORDER granting Pltf's 93 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Pltf shall have sixty days from service of this order to file his response. To this extent, Court's prior 95 Order dated 11/17/2017, is hereby amended. No further extensions of time will be granted. ( Responses due by 1/22/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/20/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER granting Deft. Carbone's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment, and dismissing without prejudice Pltf's claim against Carbone for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/1/2017. (Pltf's listed address updated to current incarceration at Lanesboro Corr. Inst. as instructed.) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) Modified text on 8/1/2017. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
70
ORDER denying Pltf's 44 Motion for Reconsideration and Pltf's 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part in accordance with this order Pltf's 58 Motion to Amend/Correct Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/18/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
March 17, 2017 |
Filing
54
CONSENT ORDER granting 49 Motion for Entry of Consent Order. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/17/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
March 1, 2017 |
Filing
42
ORDER that within 30 days of this Order, USM shall use reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defts John S. Carbone and Jennie Lancaster and in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.; and USM shall inform Court of efforts taken to locate and serve these Defts. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/28/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 29 MOTION to Dismiss. Dft Donna L. Woodruff (Assistant Director of Dental Care for the DOP, Individually and in Their Official Capacity) is dismissed from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/21/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
August 22, 2016 |
Filing
18
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/22/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
12
ORDER that 9 Amended Complaint, survives initial review under § 1915(e) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Clerk shall send Pltf summons forms to fill out so that service may be made on Defts. Once the Court receives the summons, the U.S. Marshal shall effectuate service on Defts at the addresses provided by Pltf. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/18/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?