Machnik v. Jewell et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Bloker Machnik
Defendant: Sally M. Jewell
Case Number: 1:2016cv00104
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Swain
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Memorandum of Decision and Order dated 3/29/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/03/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting deft's 31 Motion to Strike Jury Demand, and the jury demand set forth in plft's 4 Amended Complaint is hereby stricken. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/21/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying Pltf's 29 Motion to Change Venue. Rather than strike Pltf's motion without prejudice, the Court elects to SEAL Pltf's 29 Motion for Change Venue and RESTRICT access to the Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/07/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the 27 Memorandum is ORDERED to be STRICKEN from the record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/28/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Defendant's Objections to the Memorandum and Recommendation 15 are OVERRULED; the Memorandum and Recommendation 14 is ACCEPTED; and the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment 9 is DENIED. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/03/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machnik v. Jewell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bloker Machnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally M. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?