Lantern Business Credit, LLC v. Alianza Trinity Development Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lantern Business Credit, LLC
Defendant: Alianza Trinity Development Group, LLC, Alianza Trinity Holdings, LLC, Bright's Creek Golf Club, LLC, Pasquale Giordano and Omar Botero
Case Number: 1:2016cv00107
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that stay previously entered in this matter is LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan [Doc. 38] previously entered in this matter is hereby AMENDED as follows: Discovery due by 1/31/2019. Jury Trial reset for 3/11/2019 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/9/2018. (khm)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that, within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall file a report regarding the status of this action. ( Status Report due by 1/22/2018.) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/8/2018. (khm)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings until 45 days after the closing of the sale of assets in the ongoing bankruptcy proceedings in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/7/2017. (khm)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER STAYING CASE, and this action is hereby STAYED as to the Defendant Alianza Trinity Development Group, LLC only until further Order of the Court. All other claims pending in this action remain unaffected by this stay. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11//4/2016. (khm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lantern Business Credit, LLC v. Alianza Trinity Development Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lantern Business Credit, LLC
Represented By: Neale T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alianza Trinity Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alianza Trinity Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright's Creek Golf Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquale Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Botero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?