Tribal Casino Gaming Enterprise v. W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company et al

Plaintiff: Tribal Casino Gaming Enterprise
Defendant: W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company, Rentenbach Constructors Incorporated, Metromont Corporation, Chomarat US, Inc. and Chomarat North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00132
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/18/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that the parties shall provide the Court with a report regarding the status of their arbitration proceedings every 90 days until the conclusion of such proceedings, re 39 Status Report. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/07/2017. (thh)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that the motions 29 and 31 filed by Plaintiff Tribal Casino Gaming Enterprise to stay all pending deadlines, to stay this matter pending arbitration, and to compel arbitration as to Defendant W.G. Yates & Sons Con struction Company, Defendant Rentenbach Constructors Incorporated, and Defendant Metromont Corporation are hereby GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is stayed pending the resolution of the parties' arbitration proceeding as ordered herein. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/26/2016. (khm)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion for Discovery Deadline Extension. The parties shall have ten (10) days from the date the District Court rules on the pending Motions to Stay to submit their Rule 26(f) Initial Attorney's Conference Certificate and Report and Discovery Plan and the required disclosures under Rules26(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/31/16. (emw)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Chomarat US, Inc. and Chomarat North America, LLC. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/26/2016. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tribal Casino Gaming Enterprise v. W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tribal Casino Gaming Enterprise
Represented By: Michael Aaron Lay
Represented By: Erik M. Rosenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rentenbach Constructors Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metromont Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chomarat US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chomarat North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?