Moore, Jr. et al v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Moore, Jr, Howard Milton Moore, Jr. and Lena Moore
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc, 3M Company, Minnesota Mining, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Bayer Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Ericsson, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Cytec Engineered Materials Inc., General Electric Company, Honeywell International Inc., AT&T Corp., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Durez Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Rockwell Collins, Inc. and Rohm & Haas Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00157
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #178 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant General Electric Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/5/2017. (khm)
October 5, 2017 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss General Electric Company by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 10/19/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting #162 Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, and the Plaintiff's claims against this Defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/29/2017. (khm)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SUPPLEMENTAL Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/15/2017. (ejb)
September 14, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting the #173 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' claims against Dft Metropolitan Life Insurance Company are Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/11/2017. (kby)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #172 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' claims against Dft Domco Products Texas, Inc. are Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/11/2017. (kby)
September 6, 2017 Filing 173 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 9/20/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Modified on 9/6/2017 - Motions no longer referred to Dennis Howell. (khm)
September 5, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial reset for 11/13/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. (khm)
August 25, 2017 Filing 172 Joint MOTION to Dismiss only Domco Products Texas Inc., with prejudice by Domco Products Texas, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peck, Timothy). Modified on 8/28/2017 - Motion no longer referred to Dennis Howell. (khm)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #170 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Union Carbide Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/16/2017. (khm)
August 15, 2017 Filing 170 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 31, 2017 Filing 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Bouch, Timothy)
July 24, 2017 Filing 168 RESPONSE to Motion re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Replies due by 7/31/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 CHARLES LICHTENWALNER_COND CERT 071217_Part1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 CHARLES LICHTENWALNER_COND CERT 071217_Part2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 Charles Lichtenwalner to Depo 71217, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11 Lichtenwhalner Depo 03032009_COND, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12 HOWARD MOORE, JR. - VIDEO_cond_N_CERT TRANS 080416, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13 HOWARD MOORE, JR. - DISC_cond_N_CERT TRANS 080416, #15 Exhibit Ex. 14 RONNIE KING_COND CERT PDF, #16 Exhibit Ex. 15 J.C. HILL_COND CERT PDF, #17 Exhibit Ex. 16 BILL PARKER_COND CERT PDF, #18 Exhibit Ex. 17 KOEHLER DEPO 05-13-10 (Taylor)_Part1, #19 Exhibit Ex. 17 KOEHLER DEPO 05-13-10 (Taylor)_Part2, #20 Exhibit Ex. 17 KOEHLER DEPO 05-13-10 (Taylor)_Part3, #21 Exhibit Ex. 17 KOEHLER DEPO 05-13-10 (Taylor)_Part4, #22 Exhibit Ex. 17 KOEHLER DEPO 05-13-10 (Taylor)_Part5, #23 Exhibit Ex. 18 ATT Lucent Resp to Pltf Standard ROGS_Part1, #24 Exhibit Ex. 18 ATT Lucent Resp to Pltf Standard ROGS_Part2, #25 Exhibit Ex. 19 Lucent Amended Resp Master General ROG RFP030607, #26 Exhibit Ex. 21, #27 Exhibit Ex. 22 1990 - Operating Instructions for Potential Asbestos Environments, #28 Exhibit Ex. 23 IL Health Safety Act 1938, #29 Exhibit Ex. 24 OSHA 37 FR 11318 1972 Rules Regulations, #30 Exhibit Ex. 25 Walsh Healey Act 1952, #31 Exhibit Ex. 26 MAS Cutting of Flexweld Asbestos Containing Cement Boards_Part1, #32 Exhibit Ex. 26 MAS Cutting of Flexweld Asbestos Containing Cement Boards_Part2, #33 Exhibit 26 MAS Cutting of Flexweld Asbestos Containing Cement Boards_Part3, #34 Exhibit Ex. 27 MAS Stonehenge Study_Asb Board_Part1, #35 Exhibit Ex. 27 MAS Stonehenge Study_Asb Board_Part2, #36 Exhibit Ex. 27 MAS Stonehenge Study_Asb Board_Part3, #37 Exhibit Ex. 27 MAS Stonehenge Study_Asb Board_Part4, #38 Exhibit Ex. 28 NSC Founding and Charter Members, #39 Exhibit Ex. 29 - NSC News 09_1936, #40 Exhibit Ex. 30 - NSC News 11_1936, #41 Exhibit Ex. 31 - NSC 26th Natl Safety Congress_1937, #42 Exhibit Ex. 32 - NSC Transcations Vol 1-34_1951, #43 Exhibit Ex. 33 - NSC Transactions Vol1-13_1961, #44 Exhibit Ex. 34 - NSC Dusts Fumes Mists in Industry, #45 Exhibit Ex. 35 - NSC Accident Prevention Manual, #46 Exhibit Ex. 36 Industrial Hygiene Reference Library, #47 Exhibit Ex. 37 IHF Digest 09_1952, #48 Exhibit Ex. 38 IHF Digest 06_1953, #49 Exhibit Ex. 39 IHF Digest 09_1955, #50 Exhibit Ex. 40 IHF Digest 02_1956, #51 Exhibit Ex. 41 IHF Digest 09_1956_Part1, #52 Exhibit Ex. 41 IHF Digest 09_1956_Part2, #53 Exhibit Ex. 42 IHF Digest 05_1964, #54 Exhibit Ex. 43 IHF Digest 01_1966, #55 Exhibit Ex. 44 IHF Digest 09_1966, #56 Exhibit Ex. 45 Harper The Growing Importance of IH 1962, #57 Exhibit Ex. 46 Longo - Fiber Release Study 55-62, #58 Exhibit Ex. 47 The Work Environ. of Insulating Workers Balzer 1968)(Paul, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2017: #59 Ex. 20 Western Electric Ltr 06_1973 re asbestos from transite covers) NEF Regenerated. (khm)
July 24, 2017 Filing 167 ***DOCUMENT DELETED. WRONG EVENT USED. Attorney refiled. See Doc. 168. NEF Regenerated. (khm)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joshua Douglas Lee for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/12/2017. (khm)
July 12, 2017 Notice to Attorney Joshua Douglas Lee: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/19/2017. (khm)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 7/24/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail Text of Order: The parties' joint motion is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff shall have an additional seven (7) days, through and including July 24, 2017, within which to respond to the Defendant's motion for summary judgment. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/12/17. (LMR)
July 11, 2017 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua D. Lee Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3390140. by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Bouch, Timothy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 11, 2017 Filing 164 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. Responses due by 7/25/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bouch, Timothy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 3, 2017 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM in Support re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Western Electric Installation Engineering Handbook)(Bouch, Timothy)
July 3, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. Responses due by 7/17/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bouch, Timothy)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stuart J. Purdy for Lena Moore and Howard Milton Moore, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/21/2017. (khm)
June 21, 2017 Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart J. Purdy Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3369135. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Black, Janet Ward). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant AT&T Corp. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/21/2017. (khm)
June 21, 2017 Notice to Attorney Stuart J. Purdy: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/28/2017. (khm)
June 15, 2017 Filing 158 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by AT&T Corp.. Responses due by 6/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bouch, Timothy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
June 14, 2017 Filing 157 REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Parties reached an Impasse. (emw)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting Parties' #154 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and Pltfs' claims against Defendant 3M Company a/k/a Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/06/2017. (ejb)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Leave to Take the Continued Deposition of Plaintiff; and denying as moot #142 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/1/2017. (ejb)
May 31, 2017 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by 3M Company. Responses due by 6/14/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Michael). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that Defendants' are hereby directed to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take the Continued Deposition of Plaintiff Howard Moore (#151) on or before May 19, 2017. The Plaintiffs will be allowed to reply to Defendants response on or before May 23, 2017 (plus an additional 3 days if served by mail). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/17/17. (emw)
May 15, 2017 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Support re #151 MOTION For Leave to Take the Continued Deposition of Plaintiff Howard Mooore by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. (Paul, Kevin)
May 15, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION For Leave to Take the Continued Deposition of Plaintiff Howard Mooore by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 5/30/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
May 15, 2017 Filing 150 DESIGNATION of Thomas M. Clare as Mediator by all the parties. (Paul, Kevin)
May 8, 2017 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. by AT&T Corp., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Bouch, Timothy)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' #145 Request for Leave to Take Such Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/8/2017. (kby)
May 5, 2017 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr. Plaintiff Expert Reports (Paul, Kevin)
May 4, 2017 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. and Request for Leave to Take Such Deposition by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Replies due by 5/11/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Paul, Kevin)
May 4, 2017 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. and Request for Leave to Take Such Deposition by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Replies due by 5/11/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER that the Dft's #142 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. is STAYED. Plaintiffs are hereby directed to respond to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order on or before May 4, 2017. Defendants will be allowed to reply to Plaintiffs' response on or before May 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/1/2017. (kby)
April 28, 2017 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM in Support re #142 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. by AT&T Corp., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bouch, Timothy)
April 28, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. by AT&T Corp., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. Responses due by 5/12/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bouch, Timothy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying without prejudice #140 Motion for Protective Order From the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/28/17. (ejb)
April 27, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION for Protective Order from the Second Videotaped Deposition of Howard Milton Moore, Jr. by AT&T Corp., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bouch, Timothy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying #138 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/5/2017. (khm)
March 28, 2017 Filing 138 Joint MOTION to Continue Docket Call/Trial by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 4/11/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Ericsson, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/24/2017. (khm)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/24/2017. (khm)
March 23, 2017 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ericsson, Inc. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 4/6/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
March 23, 2017 Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 4/6/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #131 Joint Motion to Compel. (See order for details.) The Court DIRECTS counsel for Plaintiffs to provide a copy of this Order to Wakmed Health & Hospital. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/14/2017. (khm)
February 10, 2017 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Support re #131 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of All Pathology Slides, Original Stained Slides, Cytology Slides, and Pathology Blocks, Including all Immunohistochemical Stain Regarding Plaintiff Howard Moore from Wakmed Health Hospital by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Authorizations, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to Wakemed, #3 Exhibit C - Harris v Ajax Boiler)(Paul, Kevin)
February 10, 2017 Filing 131 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of All Pathology Slides, Original Stained Slides, Cytology Slides, and Pathology Blocks, Including all Immunohistochemical Stain Regarding Plaintiff Howard Moore from Wakmed Health Hospital by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 2/24/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
November 2, 2016 Filing 130 DESIGNATION of Lynn C. Gullick as Mediator by all the parties. (Paul, Kevin)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan for Asbestos Related Cases: Estimated Trial Time: 10 days. Discovery due by 6/1/2017. Motions due by 7/1/2017. Mediator Designation deadline set for 11/4/2016. Mediation deadline set for 6/15/2017. Jury Trial set for 1st Civil Session after 11/6/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/12/2016. (khm)
October 10, 2016 Filing 128 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Paul, Kevin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. All Defendants. (Paul, Kevin)
September 26, 2016 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/17/2016. (khm)
September 23, 2016 Filing 126 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Domco Products Texas, Inc. fka Azrock Industries, Inc. (Peck, Timothy)
September 23, 2016 Filing 125 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by Domco Products Texas, Inc. fka Azrock Industries, Inc..(Peck, Timothy)
September 22, 2016 Filing 124 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company a/k/a Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company (Griffin, Michael)
September 22, 2016 Filing 123 Defendant 3M Company's ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by 3M Company a/k/a Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company.(Griffin, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Pharmacia LLC by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr. (Paul, Kevin)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER that within 14 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file an appropriate motion or otherwise take further action with respect to the Defendant Pharmacia LLC, sued individually and as successor to Monsanto Company. The Plaintiffs are advised that failure to take further action will result in the dismissal of this Defendant. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/14/2016. (khm)
September 12, 2016 Filing 120 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc..(Merritt, Emma)
September 7, 2016 Filing 119 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc..(Bouch, Timothy)
September 7, 2016 Filing 118 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by AT&T Corp..(Bouch, Timothy)
September 7, 2016 Filing 117 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint and to Cross Claims of Any and All Other Defendants and Third Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Coltrain, Keith)
September 2, 2016 Filing 116 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, W.)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plastics Engineering Company. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Plastics Engineering Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/1/2016. (nvc)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc.. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Cytec Engineered Materials Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/1/2016. (nvc)
August 31, 2016 Filing 113 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
August 31, 2016 Filing 112 ANSWER to #110 Amended Complaint by Ericsson, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen)
August 26, 2016 Filing 111 Summons Issued Electronically as to 3M Company a/k/a Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Domco Products Texas, Inc. fka Azrock Industries, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm)
August 24, 2016 Filing 110 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Howard Milton Moore, Jr..(Paul, Kevin) (Main Document 110 replaced on 8/25/2016) NEF Regenerated. (khm)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting Pltfs' #76 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, and Pltfs shall have 10 days from entry of this Order to file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/24/16. (ejb)
August 24, 2016 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plastics Engineering Company by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
August 24, 2016 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
August 17, 2016 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. All Defendants. (Paul, Kevin)
August 10, 2016 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp. (Bouch, Timothy)
August 10, 2016 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. (Bouch, Timothy)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Dismiss and the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Rogers Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Rogers Corporation's #51 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/16. (ssh) Modified text on 8/5/2016 (khm).
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #88 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm) Modified text on 8/5/2016. NEF Regenerated (khm).
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs'claims against Defendant Eaton Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.'s #42 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm) Modified text on 8/5/2016 (khm).
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #91 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Bayer Corporation, f/k/a Mobay Chemical Company, and now known as Covestro LLC, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Rohm & Haas Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Durez Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Dismiss, and the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/2016. (khm)
August 3, 2016 Filing 93 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Schneider Electric USA, Inc. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/22/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Modified text on 8/3/2016 - Motion no longer referred to Dennis Howell. (khm)
August 1, 2016 Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Durez Corporation by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
August 1, 2016 Filing 91 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Main Document 91 replaced on 8/1/2016 with correct PDF) NEF Regenerated (ejb).
August 1, 2016 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bayer Corporation f/k/a Mobay Chemical Company n/k/a Covestro LLC by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 29, 2016 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rohn & Haas Company by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 29, 2016 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 29, 2016 Filing 87 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for Rohm & Haas Company, Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/29/2016. (kby)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. David Conner for Rohm & Haas Company, Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/29/2016. (kby)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Moffatt G. McDonald for Rohm & Haas Company, Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/29/2016. (kby)
July 28, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott E. Frick Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-3059064. by Rohm & Haas Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Sprinkle, Charles). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 28, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to W. David Conner Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-3059051. by Rohm & Haas Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Sprinkle, Charles). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 28, 2016 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Moffatt G. McDonald Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-3058992. by Rohm & Haas Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Sprinkle, Charles). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Wendy C. McGraw for Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/28/2016. (khm)
July 28, 2016 Notice to Attorney Wendy C. McGraw: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/8/2016. (khm)
July 27, 2016 Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Eaton Corporation, only by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 27, 2016 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy C. McGraw Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-3057852. by Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Merritt, Emma). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 27, 2016 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support re #76 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. (Paul, Kevin)
July 27, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1st Amended Complaint_H. Moore, #2 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 26, 2016 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., only by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 26, 2016 Filing 74 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rogers Corporation, only by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. Responses due by 8/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Kevin). Modified text on 8/2/2016 - Motions no longer referred to Dennis Howell. (khm)
July 22, 2016 Filing 73 Notice of Withdrawal of document by Rogers Corporation ***Documents terminated: #71 Notice (Other) filed by Rogers Corporation. (Dinsmore, Joan)
July 21, 2016 Filing 72 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc..(Bouch, Timothy)
July 21, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE by Rogers Corporation re #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Dinsmore, Joan)
July 20, 2016 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AT&T Corp..(Bouch, Timothy)
July 20, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Bouch on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Bouch, Timothy)
July 13, 2016 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plastics Engineering Company (Drayton, Amy)
July 13, 2016 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Plastics Engineering Company.(Drayton, Amy)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant AT&T Corp. shall have until July 20, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/08/16. (emw)
July 7, 2016 Filing 65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bouch, Timothy). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 7, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon A. Berkelhammer on behalf of Bayer Corporation (Berkelhammer, Jon)
July 7, 2016 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer Corporation re #38 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Berkelhammer, Jon)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jason I. Irvin for Rockwell Collins, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/7/2016. (khm)
July 7, 2016 Notice to Attorney Jason I. Irvin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/18/2016. (khm)
July 6, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C. Drayton on behalf of Plastics Engineering Company (Drayton, Amy)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Covestro LLC, named as Bayer Corporation f/k/a Mobay Chemical Company, shall have until 8/4/2016 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/6/2016. (khm)
July 6, 2016 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Slosson, John)
July 6, 2016 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (Davis, H.)
July 6, 2016 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc..(Davis, H.)
July 6, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Lee Davis, Jr on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Davis, H.)
July 6, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason I. Irvin Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-3038536. by Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubel, Douglas). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 5, 2016 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Peck, Timothy)
July 5, 2016 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Peck, Timothy)
July 5, 2016 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rogers Corporation. (Dinsmore, Joan)
July 5, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rogers Corporation. Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Dinsmore, Joan). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 5, 2016 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rogers Corporation (Dinsmore, Joan)
July 5, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (CORRECTED) by Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Hawkins on behalf of Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Hawkins, Eric)
July 5, 2016 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rockwell Collins, Inc..(Rubel, Douglas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ericsson, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
July 5, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rockwell Collins, Inc.. Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Rubel, Douglas). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 5, 2016 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ericsson, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen)
July 5, 2016 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Slosson, John)
July 5, 2016 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Durez Corporation (Slosson, John)
July 5, 2016 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation (Berkelhammer, Jon)
July 5, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Berkelhammer, Jon). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 5, 2016 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc..(Rosser, Brent)
July 5, 2016 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc. (Rosser, Brent)
July 5, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Claire Merritt on behalf of Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc. (Merritt, Emma)
July 5, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Alan Rosser on behalf of Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc. (Rosser, Brent)
July 5, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Andrew Bustamante on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Bustamante, Travis)
July 5, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Andrew Bustamante on behalf of Durez Corporation (Bustamante, Travis)
July 5, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Edward Tomlin on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy)
July 5, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Edward Tomlin on behalf of Durez Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy)
July 5, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Slosson on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Slosson, John)
July 5, 2016 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Durez Corporation.(Slosson, John)
July 5, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Slosson on behalf of Durez Corporation (Slosson, John)
July 4, 2016 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rohm & Haas Company (Sprinkle, Charles)
July 4, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rohm & Haas Company.(Sprinkle, Charles)
July 1, 2016 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation (Sprinkle, Charles)
July 1, 2016 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Sprinkle, Charles)
July 1, 2016 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
July 1, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
July 1, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
June 30, 2016 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc..(Bouch, Timothy)
June 30, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Bouch on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. (Bouch, Timothy)
June 30, 2016 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Holmes, Janice)
June 30, 2016 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Holmes, Janice)
June 29, 2016 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cytec Engineered Materials Inc. (Warren, R.)
June 29, 2016 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Cytec Engineered Materials Inc..(Warren, R.)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Eaton Corporation answer due 8/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/27/16. (ejb)
June 27, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time To Answer or Respond)(Dean, Laura). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
June 27, 2016 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation (Dean, Laura)
June 27, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Erb Dean on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Dean, Laura)
June 27, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Boyette on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Boyette, Richard)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kevin W. Paul for Lena Moore and Howard Milton Moore, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/23/2016. (khm)
June 22, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin W. Paul Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-3026303. by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Black, Janet Ward). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
June 22, 2016 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
June 22, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross Claims of Any and All Other Defendants and Third Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Coltrain, Keith)
June 22, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
June 9, 2016 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm)
June 9, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3013157), filed by Lena Moore, Howard Milton Moore, Jr..(Black, Janet Ward)
June 9, 2016 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore, Jr. et al v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Michael Casin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining
Represented By: Michael Casin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Berkelhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cytec Engineered Materials Inc.
Represented By: R. Kent Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Janice Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Corporation
Represented By: Joan Shreffler Dinsmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durez Corporation
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: Amy C. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Lee
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Alan Rosser
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Represented By: Emma Claire Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Laura Erb Dean
Represented By: Richard T. Boyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Represented By: Jason J. Irvin
Represented By: Eric T. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm & Haas Company
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Milton Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart J. Purdy
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: Kevin W. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Moore
Represented By: Stuart J. Purdy
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: Kevin W. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?