Ford et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Harvey Britton Ford and Kathy Regenia Ford
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00239
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/17/17. (emw)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings for an additional sixty (60) days pending the outcome of the potential nationwide settlement. The parties may seek another sixty day extension of the stay prior to the expiration of the 60 days.Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/19/16. (emw)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings for an additional sixty (60) days pending the outcome of the potential nationwide settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/21/2016. (kby)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings for sixty (60) days pending the outcome of the potential nationwide settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/24/2016. (kby)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael A. Hersh for Harvey Britton Ford, Kathy Regenia Ford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/4/2016. (kby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Britton Ford
Represented By: Michael A. Hersh
Represented By: H. Forest Horne, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Uustal
Represented By: Huntington MacCallum Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Regenia Ford
Represented By: Michael A. Hersh
Represented By: H. Forest Horne, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Uustal
Represented By: Huntington MacCallum Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christopher Ray Kiger
Represented By: Kirk Gibson Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?