Waugh v. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Junior Waugh
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Autozone, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Blackmer Pump Company, Borg-Warner Morse TEC, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., CBS Corporation, CertainTeed Corporation, Covil Corporation, Crane Co., Dana Companies LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Deere & Company, Flowserve US Inc., Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Pneumo Abex, LLC, RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Inc., Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Viad Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, William Powell Company and Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00310
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Catawba
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER that the Plaintiffs claims against the Defendants Covil Corporation; Daniel International Corporation, formerly known as Daniel Construction Company, Inc.; Flowserve US Inc, individually and as successor to Byron Jackson Pump Company; Fluor Constructors International, formerly known as Fluor Corporation; Fluor Constructors International, Inc.; Fluor Enterprises, Inc.; and Union Carbide Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case remains stayed with respect to the Plaintiffs claims against the Defendant Georgia-Pacific, LLC. [See Doc. 246] Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/4/2019. (kby)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the 420 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and ADMITS Jessica M. Dean to practice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/17/2018. (maf)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting 409 parties Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/12/18. (emw)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 SUPPLEMENTAL Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan re 252 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/9/18. (emw)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER denying 356 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Covil Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/11/18. (emw)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 330 Motion to Dismiss all the Plaintiff's claims against defendant Warren Pumps, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/17/2018. (ni)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting 326 Motion to Dismiss, and all the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant BW/IP, Inc., and its wholly owned subsidiaries, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/07/18. (emw)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting parties' 321 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant The William Powell Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/03/18. (emw)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting parties' 317 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of Pltf's claims against Deft Pneumo Abex LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 730/2018. (ejb)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting 313 Joint Motion to Dismiss Honeywell International Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/24/18. (emw)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 312 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Ronald G. Tate, Jr. for BW/IP, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/20/2018. (ejb)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting 293 Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Crane Co. only. All of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Crane Co. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Crane Co. terminated. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/21/2018. (kby)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting 287 and 288 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Allyson R. Twilley and T. David Rheney to practice pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant BW/IP while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/20/2018. (maf)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 283 Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Autozone, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/18/18. (emw)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 276 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Deere & Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/11/18. (emw)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 264 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Ford Motor Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/16/18. (emw)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDED ORDER granting Parties' 258 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, and of Pltf's claims against the Deft Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC (successor by merger to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and incorrectly identified as successor in interest to International Talc Co.) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/01/2018. (ejb) (Amending 259 Order on Motion to Dismiss.)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting Parties' 258 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of Pltf's claims against Deft Vanderbilt Materials, LLC (successor by merger to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and incorrectly identified as successor in interest to International Talc Co.) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/30/2018. (ejb)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting 255 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/23/18. (emw)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting 251 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Farah S. Nicol for Bechtel Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/07/17. (emw)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER STAYING this action pursuant to filing of 245 Suggestion of Bankruptcy as to Deft Georgia-Pacific LLC (now known as Bestwall LLC) only until further Order of the Court. All other claims pending in this action remain un affected by this stay. FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall file a status report with the Court every 90 days until bankruptcy proceeding is completed or automatic stay is lifted, whichever comes first. (Parties' 1st Status Report due by 2/12/2018.) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/14/2017. (ejb)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 201 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant LG Electronic U.S.A. Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/30/2017. (kby)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER that within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file an appropriate motion or otherwise take further action with respect to the Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. The Plaintiff is advised that failure to take further action within the time required will result in the dismissal of this Defendant. Appropriate Document due by 8/22/2017. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/08/17. (emw)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file an appropriate motion or otherwise take further action with respect to the Defendants LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and RT Vanderbilt Holding Company , Inc., sued individually and as successor in interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. Failure to take further action within the time required will result in the dismissal of these Defendants. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/30/2016. (khm)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for Advance Auto Parts, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation, Dana Companies LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/21/16. (ejb)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sabrina G. Stone for Jack Junior Waugh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/03/16. (emw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waugh v. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Junior Waugh
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Sabrina G. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse TEC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christopher Ray Kiger
Represented By: Kirk Gibson Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Heather B. Adams
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Kyre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell, LLC
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Eric T. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, LLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: David B Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?