Combs v. Heebner
Plaintiff: John Alexander Combs
Defendant: Richard M. Heebner
Case Number: 1:2016cv00324
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cherokee
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal and Notice of Settlement is held in ABEYANCE. It is Ordered that Dft's counsel shall provide to the Court detailed and particular information as to the reasons why an extension of 90 days would be merited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/30/2017. (kby)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying in part and allowing in part 14 Amended Consent Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Extend Certain Deadlines. The motion to stay the proceedings in this matter is DENIED. The portion of the motion that requests an extension of various deadlines will be allowed and the deadlines shall be extended as follows: Expert Report Deadlines: April 1, 2017 (Plaintiff) & May 1, 2017 (Defendant), Discovery: September 1, 2017, Mediation: September 15, 2017 and Motion: October 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/13/2017. (thh)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice 12 Motion to Stay Case or, in the Alternative, to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/3/2017. (khm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. Heebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alexander Combs
Represented By: W. Perry Fisher, II
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Heebner
Represented By: Lucienne Hartmann Peoples
Represented By: John E. Spainhour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?