United States of America v. Approximately 1439 Sabre Defence Industries M16 A2, A3, and A4 5.56 caliber machine guns et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately 1439 Sabre Defence Industries M16 A2, A3, and A4 5.56 caliber machine guns, Approximately 538 Manroy XR16 5.56 caliber machine guns, Approximately 124 Sabre Defence Industries XR16 5.56 caliber machine guns, Approximately 6 Sabre Defence Industries XR15 A2 and A3 5.56 caliber machine guns, Approximately 1 Manroy XR15 5.56 caliber machine gun, Approximately 1 Browning M2 .50 caliber machine gun, Approximately 1 SAW M249 machine gun, Approximately 1 Colt 9mm machine gun, Approximately 1 Heckler & Koch MP5 9mm machine gun, Approximately 1 Miscellaneous Silencer / Suppressor Part for .50 caliber machine gun, Approximately 6 Ramo Inc. M-2 .50 caliber machine guns, Approximately 15 XR16 5.56 caliber machine guns for which the manufacturer is unknown, Approximately 107 Sabre Defence Industries M2 .50 caliber machine guns, Approximately 17 M16 / XR16 type machine gun receivers for which the manufacturer is unknown and unmarked and Approximately 142 machine gun receiver right hand side plates for which the manufacturer is unknown and unmarked
Case Number: 1:2016cv00359
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting the Government's 86 Motion for Default Judgment of Forfeiture in favor of the United States against all persons and entities in the world, excluding Zeta Capital Limited, with respect to the Defendant Properties. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/19/2019. (kby)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CONSENT ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY CLAIM granting the 71 Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment Motion for Entry of Consent Order for Third Party Claim, terminating the 70 MOTION in Limine Government's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Innocent Owner Defense and Eighth Amendment Challenge. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/2/2019. (kby)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SUPPLEMENTAL Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/9/2018. (ni)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 58 Government's Motion to Dismiss, and the machinegun identified as Ramo.50 caliber M-2, Serial number 003401 is hereby DISMISSED from this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/25/2018. (khm)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying the Government's 44 Third Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/31/2018. (kby)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER directing the Parties to submit an updated Initial Attorney's Conference Report 2 weeks from entry of this Order. (updated CIAC Report due by 12/21/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/07/2017. (ejb)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay and STAYS this case for ninety (90) days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/12/17. (emw)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 32 Zeta Capital Limited's Motion for Leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/9/2017. (khm)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Michael B. Schwegler for Zeta Capital Limited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/10/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Court STRIKES the Pro Se Claims [# 7 & # 8] and the Pro Se Answers [# 10 & #11]. Sabre and Manroy shall have ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to obtain counsel licensed to practice in this Court to appear on their behalf. This Court, however, will not allow either corporation to appear pro se in this Court.Signed: January. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/6/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately 1439 Sabre Defence Industries M16 A2, A3, and A4 5.56 caliber machine guns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1439 Sabre Defence Industries M16 A2, A3, and A4 5.56 caliber machine guns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 538 Manroy XR16 5.56 caliber machine guns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 124 Sabre Defence Industries XR16 5.56 caliber machine guns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 6 Sabre Defence Industries XR15 A2 and A3 5.56 caliber machine guns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1 Manroy XR15 5.56 caliber machine gun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1 Browning M2 .50 caliber machine gun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1 SAW M249 machine gun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1 Colt 9mm machine gun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1 Heckler & Koch MP5 9mm machine gun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1 Miscellaneous Silencer / Suppressor Part for .50 caliber machine gun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 6 Ramo Inc. M-2 .50 caliber machine guns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 15 XR16 5.56 caliber machine guns for which the manufacturer is unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 107 Sabre Defence Industries M2 .50 caliber machine guns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 17 M16 / XR16 type machine gun receivers for which the manufacturer is unknown and unmarked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 142 machine gun receiver right hand side plates for which the manufacturer is unknown and unmarked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?