Brown v. Georgia Pacific LLC
Plaintiff: Don Frank Brown
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00384
Filed: November 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Watauga
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING CASE until further Order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall file a status report with the Court every 90 days until bankruptcy proceeding is completed or automatic stay is lifted, whichever comes first. (Parties' 1st Status Report due by 2/12/2018.) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/14/2017. (ejb)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Christopher Owen Massenburg for Georgia Pacific LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/10/17. (ejb)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Sabrina G. Stone for Don Frank Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/9/16. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Georgia Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Frank Brown
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Sabrina G. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?