Hildebran v. Insulet Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Eric Hildebran
Defendant: Insulet Corporation and Does
Case Number: 1:2017cv00040
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Burke
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Order Deadlines and Trial Date . Discovery due by 5/1/201, Motions due by 6/1/2018, Mediation deadline set for 5/15/2018, Ready for Trial Date 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/03/18. (emw)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jennifer L. Siegel for Party Eric Hildebran previously added during case transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/07/17. (emw)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Geoffrey M. Coan for Insulet Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/10/2017. (kby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hildebran v. Insulet Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hildebran
Represented By: S. Ranchor Harris, III
Represented By: James G O'Callahan
Represented By: Jennifer L Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insulet Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Coan
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Represented By: Kathleen E. Kelly
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?