Wilson v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Kristena Wilson
Defendant: Shane Davis and City of Kings Mountain
Case Number: 1:2017cv00252
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Loann Meekins as Guardian Ad Litem for T.W. and directing the Clerk to SEAL the 17 Miscellaneous Filing to case participants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/2018. (kby)
February 6, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until February 12, 2018, to file the appropriate guardianship papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/06/18. (emw)
January 19, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Extension of Time By Which to File Guardianship Papers . Plaintiff shall have until February 5, 2018, to file the appropriate guardianship papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/19/18. (emw)
January 5, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's counsel is to file a motion on or before January 18, 2017 to have Plaintiff's mother, or someone else qualified, to be appointed as a guardian ad litem for T.W. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/05/18. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristena Wilson
Represented By: Geraldine Sumter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kings Mountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?