Teter v. Project Veritas Action Fund et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Teter
Defendant: Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas and James E. O'Keefe, III
Case Number: 1:2017cv00256
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This action is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Case No. 1:17-cv-00129-MR for the purpose of conducting discovery. The parties shall continue to file pleadings in their respective cases only. The parties in each case shall conduct an initial attorneys' conference and file a certificate of initial attorneys conference by 4/4/2018. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/13/2018. (maf)
February 23, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendants' 16 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall submit a memorandum, not to exceed 5 pages, addressing whether consolidation of this matter with Campbell v. Teter, et al., Civil Case No. 1:17-cv-00129-MR, is appropriate. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for conducting an initial attorneys' conference is hereby STAYED until the Court addresses the issue of consolidation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/23/2018. (khm)
November 6, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Ralph Streza for Shirley Teter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/6/2017. (kby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teter v. Project Veritas Action Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Teter
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Falcone
Represented By: Sean W. Fernandes
Represented By: Jonathan Drew Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Veritas Action Fund
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Michael Montecalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Veritas
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Michael Montecalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. O'Keefe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?