Relion Manufacturing, Inc. v. Tri-Pac, Inc.

Plaintiff: Relion Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Tri-Pac, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00282
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Defendant's 22 Objections to the Memorandum and Recommendation are OVERRULED; the 21 Memorandum and Recommendation is ACCEPTED; and the Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/7/2018. (khm)
May 22, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: DISMISSING as moot Plaintiff's 9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/22/2018. (maf)
February 1, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court finds that the 11 Order granting Pltf's Motion to Stay was improperly entered, therefore, the Court DISSOLVES the stay; the Court GRANTS Deft's 13 MOTION for Leave to File A Response to Relion's 9 Motion to Stay; and Pltf's Responses to Deft's 6 MOTION to Dismiss is due on or by 2/9/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/01/2018. (ejb)
January 19, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pltf's 9 Motion to Stay, and this case is STAYED through and including 3/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/19/2018. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Relion Manufacturing, Inc. v. Tri-Pac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relion Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Durr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Pac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?