Martin v. Murray et al
Plaintiff: |
Mitchell Joseph Martin |
Defendant: |
Chad Murray, Rutherfordton City Police Dept., Rutherford County Jail Admin. and Rachel Ruppe |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00329 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Rutherford |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 15, 2021 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 44 Motion. The Clerk is respectfully instructed to mail the Plaintiff a blank prisoner § 1983 complaint form and a blank § 2241 petition form. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/13/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing
43
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/30/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
August 24, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting Deft Rachel Ruppe's 30 Motion to Dismiss; denying Pltf's 35 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel; and instructing Clerk of Court to terminate Rachel Ruppe as a Deft in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/24/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant Ruppe's 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint within 14 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/14/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
August 1, 2018 |
Filing
28
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER granting parties 26 Joint Consent Order for the Production of Medical Records & PHI as set forth in this Order. See Order for further details and instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/31/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER that the 11 Amended Complaint survives initial review under 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Clerk is directed to mail summons forms to Pla to fill out and return for service of process on Defendants Patterson, Ruppe, and Waddell. See Order for additional details. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/11/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
April 11, 2018 |
Filing
10
ORDER that Plaintiff's 3 LETTER and MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel are DENIED. See Order for further information. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/11/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?