Conner v. Cleveland County Emergency Medical Services
Plaintiff: Sara B. Conner
Defendant: Cleveland County Emergency Medical Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file any motions to certify a class under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 or to conditionally certify a collective action under the FLSA or a motion to revive the Fed. R. Civ. P 23 and FL SA collective action motion [Doc. 35] previously deemed moot by the Court no later than 4/18/2022; Defendant shall file any response to the Plaintiff's motions under Rule 23 and/or Section 216(b) no later than 5/18/2022 or 30 days following serv ice of Plaintiff's motion[s], whichever is earlier; and Plaintiff shall file a reply to any response to the Plaintiff's motions under Rule 23 and/or Section 216(b), if allowed, no later than 5/31/2022 or 14 days following service of Defendant's response brief, whichever is earlier. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/16/2022. (khm)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Memorandum of Decision and Order dated 8/21/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part, denying in part Parties' 33 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Scheduling Order, to extent parties' deadlines are hereby AMENDED as follows: Certification Discovery due by 11/12/2018; Pltf's Rule 23 and/or Section 216(b) Motions due by 12/12/2018; Deft's Response due by 1/14/2019; and Pltf's Reply due by 1/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/10/2018. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Cleveland County Emergency Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara B. Conner
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County Emergency Medical Services
Represented By: Grant B. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?