Hinkle v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Teri Lynn Hinkle
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC and Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00007
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cherokee
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Dismissal, and all of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Trans Union, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/21/2018. (khm)
June 11, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, and all of the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/11/2018. (khm)
April 3, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court DISMISSES Defendant Trans Union, LLCs 12 motion to dismiss as moot and without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/3/2018. (maf)
March 27, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/2018. (kby)
February 13, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Autumn Hamit Patterson for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/13/2018.(khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinkle v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Lynn Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?