Saulmon v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Georgiana Salter Saulmon
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00029
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Burke
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Consent Motion for Attorney Fees Under EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/27/2018. (kby)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/30/2018. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 8/30/2018. (maf)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Lindsay F. Osterhout for Georgiana Salter Saulmon. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/13/2018. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saulmon v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiana Salter Saulmon
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Represented By: Lindsay F. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?