Alvarez et al v. Lassiter et al
Plaintiff: |
Eli Alvarez, Givonno Carter, Marvin H. Johnson, Malcolm Tharrington and Brian L. Martin, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Kennith Lassiter, Hubert Corpening, Donny Watkings, Jenny Jenkins and Gregory Swink |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00116 |
Filed: |
May 1, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
McDowell |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 7, 2018 |
Filing
18
ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's claim that Defendants deprived him of property without due process for prospective injunctive relief has passed initial review. Remaining claims are dismissed. 2) Plaintiff Alvarez's 9 Motio n to Amend is DENIED as stated in this Order; the Clerk of Court shall docket the Amended Complaint, (Doc. No. 9 -1), as the operative Amended Complaint. 3) Plaintiff's 5 Motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. 4) Plaintif f's 6 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. 5) The Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service for Defendants Lassiter, Corpening, Watkings, Jenkins, and Swink. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/6/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
|
September 27, 2018 |
Filing
14
ORDER: (1) This case is severed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 20 and 21. (2) The instant case shall proceed with Eli Alvarez as Plaintiff. The other Plaintiffs shall be terminated from this case. (3) The Clerk s hall open a new case for Plaintiff Carter in which docket entries 1 , 3 , 4 , 5 -7, 10 , and 11 shall be docketed. (4) The Clerk shall open a new case for Plaintiff Johnson in which docket entries 1 , 3 , 5 -6, 12 , and 13 shall be do cketed. (5) The Clerk shall open a new case for Plaintiff Tharrington in which copies of docket entries 1 , 3 , 7 , and 8 shall be docketed. (6) The Clerk shall open a new case for Plaintiff Martin, in which copies of docket entries 1 and 3 shall be docketed. (7) The Motions that appear at docket entries 4 and 8 shall be terminated from Plaintiff Alvarez's case. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/26/2018. (Pro se litigants served by U.S. Mail.) (maf)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER re 1 Complaint: Plaintiffs shall have 21 days (until 6/5/2018) in which to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Order and all applicable rules and procedures. During that time, Plaintiffs Carter, Johnson , Tharrington, and Martin, shall also file motions to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiffs fail to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Order, this action will be dismissed and closed without prejudice and without further notice as to Plaintiffs Carter, Johnson, Tharrington, and Martin, and the matter will proceed solely with regards to Plaintiff Alvarez. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/14/2018. (Pro se litigants served by US Mail.) (maf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?