United States of America v. 129 Reservoir Ridge Drive, Cullowhee, NC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 129 Reservoir Ridge Drive, Cullowhee, NC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00117
Filed: May 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Substitute Party. Flagstart Bank, FSB added. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/23/2019. (khm)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 19 Motion to Substitute Party: Flagstar is DIRECTED to provide, within 10 days of the entry of this Order, clarification of its position regarding the loan. If Flagstar is not the owner of the loan, its respon se should include authorities to support its position that a loan servicer, and not the owner of a loan, would be the proper party to a civil forfeiture proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/3/2019. (Submission due by 5/16/2019.) (maf)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay. The Court DIRECTS counsel for Claimant Miller to give notice to the Court when the criminal matters have been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/10/2018. (khm)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Claimant Mark Loren Miller's Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/7/2018. (khm)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER and NOTICE AND LIS PENDENS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/01/2018. (ni)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 129 Reservoir Ridge Drive, Cullowhee, NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 129 Reservoir Ridge Drive, Cullowhee, NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?