Perdue v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Plaintiff: Janet Perdue
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00221
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: XX, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Motions due by 6/1/2019. Mediator Designation deadline set for 10/11/2018. Mediation deadline set for 5/15/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 at 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/25/2018. (ejb)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Gessner, L.)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/20/2018. (emw)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Sprain, Theresa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Sprain, Theresa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon D. Townsend on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Townsend, Jonathon)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa M. Sprain on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Sprain, Theresa)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Janet Perdue. All Defendants. (Gessner, L.)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (emw)
August 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(emw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3767588), filed by Janet Perdue.(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdue v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Theresa M. Sprain
Represented By: Jonathon D. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Perdue
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?