Cornwell v. U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Cornwell
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration and Selamawit Hailegiorgis
Case Number: 1:2018cv00225
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cherokee
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Brenda Cornwell. Selamawit Hailegiorgis served on 9/12/2018. (Carpenter, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/28/2018 to reflect that Affidavit of Service refers to Selamawit Hailegiorgis and removed answer due deadline for the U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration. NEF Regenerated. (khm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration, filed by Brenda Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carpenter, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/24/2018 (kby).
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and Local Rule 73.1(A)(2). (ni)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Selamawit Hailegiorgis, US Attorney. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and Local Rule 73.1(A)(2). (ni) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/14/2018) (ni). Modified text on 8/14/2018. NEF regenerated (ni).
August 8, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ni)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Brenda Cornwell against U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3771360), filed by Brenda Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carpenter, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornwell v. U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation Federal Highway Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selamawit Hailegiorgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cornwell
Represented By: Kimberly N Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?