Mann v. Graebner et al
Plaintiff: Chad Allen Mann
Defendant: James Paul Graebner and Givens Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00250
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
2 Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Chad Allen Mann. Givens Transportation, Inc. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 11/10/2018. (Melrose, Mark)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Defendant Givens' #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Givens has up to and including November 10, 2018, within which to file an answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/28/2018. (khm)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Givens Transportation, Inc.. (Walsh, Austin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chad Allen Mann (Melrose, Mark)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to James Paul Graebner and Givens Transportation, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Givens Transportation, Inc.)(emw)
September 5, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(emw)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3798909), filed by Chad Allen Mann.(Melrose, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Graebner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Paul Graebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Givens Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Austin Ryan Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Allen Mann
Represented By: Mark Russell Melrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?