Brooks v. Indaba Scientific, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marybee Brooks
Defendant: Indaba Scientific, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00259
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 6/10/2019. Motions due by 7/9/2019. Mediator Designation deadline set for 11/27/2018. Mediation deadline set for 6/24/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 at 09:01 AM (the 1st Trial Term on or after 12/9/2019) in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/08/2018. (ejb)
November 2, 2018 Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Fletcher, Murphy)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Murphy Horne Fletcher on behalf of Indaba Scientific, Inc. (Fletcher, Murphy)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/1/2018. (kby)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indaba Scientific, Inc. (Rockoff, Sabrina)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Indaba Scientific, Inc..(Rockoff, Sabrina)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Indaba Scientific, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Indaba Scientific, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3805483), filed by Marybee Brooks.(Gibbons, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Indaba Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybee Brooks
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indaba Scientific, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina P. Rockoff
Represented By: Murphy Horne Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?