Rosenbloom v. Hunley et al
Plaintiff: Shannon W. Rosenbloom and Shannon Rosenbloom
Defendant: Dee Hunley, Hand and Stone Massage and Facial Spa and Karen Reid
Case Number: 1:2018cv00261
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
2 Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hand and Stone Massage and Facial Spa served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; Dee Hunley served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; Karen Reid served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (emw)
November 2, 2018 Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Text of Order: The Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendants shall have an extension of time, through and including November 26, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/24/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(LMR)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Hand and Stone Massage and Facial Spa, Dee Hunley, Karen Reid. (Ramseur, Patti). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued (w/USM-285s) Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Hand and Stone Massage and Facial Spa, Dee Hunley, Karen Reid. (ni) Modified text on 10/18/2018 (ejb).
September 26, 2018 A copy of the #3 Order and 3 blank summons forms mailed to plaintiff with instructions to complete and return to the Court for process by the Marshal Service. Summons due by 10/2/2018. (Sent via regular mail on 9/26/18 to Shannon Rosenbloom at 58 Fox Fire Drive # B, Asheville, NC 28803) (maf)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff shall submit summonses to the Clerk within 7 days of entry of this Order. Upon receipt of the summons, the Clerk shall deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for service. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the Defendants at the expense of the U.S. Government. It remains the responsibility of the Plaintiff to make sure that process is effected. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/25/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Rosenbloom. (emw). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. Modified Pltf's name on 9/21/2018 (ejb).
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hand and Stone Massage and Facial Spa, Dee Hunley, Karen Reid, filed by Shannon Rosenbloom. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(emw) Modified Pltf's name on 9/21/2018 (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenbloom v. Hunley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Hunley
Represented By: Patti West Ramseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hand and Stone Massage and Facial Spa
Represented By: Patti West Ramseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Reid
Represented By: Patti West Ramseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon W. Rosenbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Rosenbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?