Pannell et al v. Scruggs et al
Plaintiff: Nikesia Sharey Pannell and Choya Hassiba Johnson
Defendant: Jeffrey Michael Gowder, Southern Concrete Specialties, Inc. and Matthew Taylor Scruggs
Case Number: 1:2018cv00271
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
2 Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Defts' #9 Motion to Revoke Admission Pro Hac Vice of Yussuf Aleem. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/16/2018. (ejb)
November 2, 2018 Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #9 MOTION to Revoke re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Yussuf Aleem This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Yussuf Aleem Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3829836., #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Revoke Admission Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Taylor Scruggs, Southern Concrete Specialties, Inc. Responses due by 11/13/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support)(Connor, Heather). Motions no longer referred to Dennis Howell. Modified text on 11/2/2018 (ejb).
October 18, 2018 SECOND Notice to Yussuf Aleen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/25/2018. (tmg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew Taylor Scruggs (Connor, Heather)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Concrete Specialties, Inc. (Connor, Heather)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Graham Connor on behalf of Matthew Taylor Scruggs, Southern Concrete Specialties, Inc. (Connor, Heather)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Matthew Taylor Scruggs, Southern Concrete Specialties, Inc..(Connor, Heather)
October 10, 2018 Notice to Yussuf Aleen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/17/2018. (emw)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Yussuf Aleem for Nikesia Sharey Pannell and Choya Hassiba Johnson. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/10/18. (emw)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Yussuf Aleem Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3829836. by Nikesia Sharey Pannell. (Rufty, Daniel). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
September 24, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3816752), filed by Nikesia Sharey Pannell, Choya Hassiba Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DMV-349)(Rufty, Daniel) Modified text to add additional filer of this Complaint on 9/24/2018. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pannell et al v. Scruggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikesia Sharey Pannell
Represented By: Daniel Spencer Rufty
Represented By: Yussuf Aleem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choya Hassiba Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Spencer Rufty
Represented By: Yussuf Aleem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Michael Gowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Concrete Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Graham Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Taylor Scruggs
Represented By: Heather Graham Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?