United States of America v. Approximately $7,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $7,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: James Hunter Rogers
Case Number: 1:2018cv00321
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James Hunter Rogers.(Hedrick, Edward)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date December 8, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 CLAIM Verified Claim for Seized Property by James Hunter Rogers. (Hedrick, Edward)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 USMS Return of Service for Warrant for Arrest In Rem served on 11/08/18. (emw) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/14/2018) (emw). NEF regenerated.
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest In Rem of Property. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 11/07/18. (emw)
November 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(emw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against Approximately $7,500.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Letzring, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $7,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Letzring
Represented By: Jonathan D. Letzring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Hunter Rogers
Represented By: Edward Lawrence Hedrick, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?