United States of America v. Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Shelly Medrano and Rahkim Franklin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
0 Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
1 Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Kilbourne, Jr on behalf of Rahkim Franklin, Shelly Medrano (Kilbourne, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike Certain Paragraphs of the Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rahkim Franklin, Shelly Medrano.(Dungan, Robert)
February 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Claims re #1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency due by 3/11/2019. (khm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date February 7, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified Joint Claim of Ownership by Rahkim Franklin, Shelly Medrano. (Dungan, Robert) Modified text on 2/7/2019 to change from a Miscellaneous Filing to a Claim, and to replace Rahkim Franklin, Shelly Medrano as filers of this document. NEF Regenerated. (ejb).
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem Returned Executed as to Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency on 1/10/19. (ejb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan D. Letzring on behalf of United States of America, Attorney Benjamin Bain-Creed terminated. (Letzring, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property In Rem. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 1/07/2019. (ejb)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $13,205.54 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Represented By: Jonathan D. Letzring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shelly Medrano
Represented By: Robert Edward Dungan
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rahkim Franklin
Represented By: Robert Edward Dungan
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?