HVAC, Inc. v. MSK Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: HVAC, Inc.
Defendant: MSK Construction, Inc. and United Fire and Casualty
Case Number: 1:2019cv00022
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
0 Judge: Max O Cogburn
1 Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United Fire and Casualty, MSK Construction, Inc.. United Fire and Casualty waiver sent on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019; MSK Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Cochran, Chad)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Anne Buttrick on behalf of MSK Construction, Inc., United Fire and Casualty (Buttrick, Emily)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J. Cochran on behalf of MSK Construction, Inc., United Fire and Casualty (Cochran, Chad)
February 13, 2019 Notice to Attorney James W. Elliott, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/20/2019. (khm)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James W. Elliott, Jr. for HVAC, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/13/2019. (khm) Modified on 2/13/2019 to correct spelling of Mr. Elliott's name. (khm)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James W. Elliott, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3938383. by HVAC, Inc.. (Kurdys, Mark). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HVAC, Inc. (Kurdys, Mark)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to United Fire & Casualty Company on 24 January 2019 by HVAC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Summons)(Kurdys, Mark)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to MSK Construction, Inc. on 24 January 2019 by HVAC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Summons)(Kurdys, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3918736), filed by HVAC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract, #2 Exhibit Payment Bond)(Kurdys, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/23/2019) (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HVAC, Inc. v. MSK Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSK Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Anne Buttrick
Represented By: Chad J. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty
Represented By: Emily Anne Buttrick
Represented By: Chad J. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HVAC, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Clifford Kurdys
Represented By: James W. Elliott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?