Ashe v. Amburgey et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ashe
Defendant: J. Thomas Amburgey, Fredilyn Sison, Sheriff's Office, Stephen Lacey Cash, BCDC, Rodney Gene Hasty, Don Gast and Jonathan Mason
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 19-6362 for #11 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Karen Stump. (ni)
March 15, 2019 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #11 Notice of Appeal. (maf)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals re: #11 Notice of Appeal. (maf)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order and #9 Clerk's Judgment by Kenneth Ashe. (IFP - PLRA) (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Kenneth Ashe. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 03/07/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/27/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii) and 42 U.S.C. 1997e(e). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/26/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (khm) Modified on 2/27/2019 to correct date signed. (khm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Kenneth Ashe (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kby)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court), provided by FCI Edgefield. (kby)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 02/11/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Subponeas as to BCDC, Rodney Gene Hasty, Stephen Lacey Cash, and Don Gast by Kenneth Ashe. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Subponeas as to Fredilyn Sison, J. Thomas Amburgey, and Jonathan Mason by Kenneth Ashe. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Kenneth Ashe. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Clerk, #2 Envelope) (maf)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Ashe against J. Thomas Amburgey, BCDC, Stephen Lacey Cash, Don Gast, Rodney Gene Hasty, Jonathan Mason, Sheriff's Office, and Fredilyn Sison. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashe v. Amburgey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Thomas Amburgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredilyn Sison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Lacey Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Gene Hasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Gast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?