Simmons v. Ingles Markets Inc. et al
Plaintiff: George Murray Simmons, II
Defendant: Jeff LNU, Greg Huges, Ingles Markets Inc. and Greg Hughes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 3/28/2019 as to Jeff LNU. (khm) Modified on 4/4/2019 to correct filed date. (khm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Greg Hughes served on 3/16/2019, answer due 4/6/2019; (kby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2019: #1 Envelope) (kby). Modified on 4/4/2019 to change date of service for Greg Hughes from 3/13/2019 to 3/16/2019, the answer due date from 4/3/2019 to 4/6/2019, and removed summons returned date for Jeff LNU. NEF Regenerated. (khm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Murray Simmons, II. Ingles Markets Inc. served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kby)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Ingles Markets Inc., Greg Hughes, and Jeff LNU. (maf)
March 5, 2019 Filing Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number CHD052904. (jaw)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from George Murray Simmons enclosing filing fee, providing proposed summons, and requesting information about service of process. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
February 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 3/13/2019. (khm)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay the required $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to pay the required filing fee within 30 will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/8/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
February 7, 2019 *** Please Disregard entry. Determined that Case Assignment Packet will not be issued until after the Court has acted on the #2 IFP app. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Murray Simmons, II. Motion referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by George Murray Simmons, II against Ingles Markets Inc., Greg Huges, and Jeff LNU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Proposed Summonses, #3 Envelope) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Ingles Markets Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Huges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingles Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Murray Simmons, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?