Wilson v. Marion Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Karen Sue Wilson
Defendant: Mission McDowell Hospital, Marion Police Department, Marion Sheriff's Department and Wake Forest Baptist Hospital
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 19-1294 for #6 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Kirsten Hancock. (ni)
March 19, 2019 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (maf)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (maf) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/19/2019 with version that contains correct date of document. NEF Regenerated.) (maf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order and #4 Clerk's Judgment by Karen Sue Wilson. (IFP) (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Karen Wilson to Judge Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/4/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Plaintiffs #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis is ALLOWED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/2/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karen Sue Wilson. (maf) Modified text on 2/20/2019 to remove reference of referral to MJ. (maf)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Karen Sue Wilson against Marion Police Department, Marion Sheriff's Department, Mission McDowell Hospital, and Wake Forest Baptist Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Cover Sheet) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Marion Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission McDowell Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake Forest Baptist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sue Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?