United States of America v. $98,130.12 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $98,130.12 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Rodney Allison and Latasha Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Verified Claims due by 4/24/2019. (ejb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rodney Allison, Latasha Johnson. (Coleman, Calvin) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (ni).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date March 24, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM property by Rodney Allison, Latasha Johnson. (Coleman, Calvin) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (ni).
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 USMS Return of Service re: #2 for Warrant for Arrest in Rem. $98,130.12 received into USMS custody. (maf)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest in Rem of Property. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 02/22/2019. (ni)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ni)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $98,130.12 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Letzring, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $98,130.12 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $98,130.12 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan D. Letzring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney Allison
Represented By: Calvin Edward Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Latasha Johnson
Represented By: Calvin Edward Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?